Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Markus Kenji Ogawa | 22.01.1998 | 02.11.1999 | direktion |
Susan Ringdal | 01.11.1995 | 22.01.1998 | direktion |
Nobutaka Ogawa | 14.01.1982 | 02.11.1999 | direktion |
Inge Beck Gundersen | 14.01.1982 | 01.11.1995 | direktion |
Lisbeth Thygesen | 14.01.1982 | 26.01.1993 | direktion |
Anne-Lise Hartmann Lohse | 14.01.1982 | 23.11.1990 | direktion |
Niels Suchey-Mossbeck | 14.01.1982 | 26.04.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Markus Kenji Ogawa | 22.01.1998 | 02.11.1999 | bestyrelse |
Hannelore Berta Steiner-Ogawa | 22.01.1998 | 02.11.1999 | bestyrelse |
Susan Ringdal | 29.01.1997 | 22.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Axel Ringdal | 01.11.1995 | 22.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Yasunori Sohda | 14.01.1982 | 02.11.1999 | formand |
Inge Ingetoft | 14.01.1982 | 29.01.1997 | bestyrelse |
Ivar Marinius Gundersen | 14.01.1982 | 01.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jakob Lund Poulsen | 14.01.1982 | 02.07.1993 | bestyrelse |
Merethe Ellinor Stagetorn | 14.01.1982 | 26.04.1988 | bestyrelse |
Niels Suchey-Mossbeck | 14.01.1982 | 26.04.1988 | bestyrelse |