Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Cecilie Mortensdatter Thorsmark | 01.11.2018 | 09.01.2021 | adm. dir |
Camilla Frank | 01.01.2017 | 31.08.2018 | adm. dir |
Eva Franck-Kruse | 20.06.2008 | 01.01.2017 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Egelund | 01.06.2019 | 09.01.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Thomas Klausen | 01.01.2019 | 09.01.2021 | formand |
Cecilie Ingdal | 22.05.2018 | 09.01.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Thomas Klausen | 03.05.2016 | 31.12.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Nikolai Bo Klausen | 03.05.2016 | 22.05.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Niels Eskildsen | 01.10.2015 | 09.01.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Jacob Kampp Berliner | 01.10.2015 | 01.01.2019 | formand |
Jens Obel Jørgensen | 12.05.2015 | 09.01.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Nicolaj Reffstrup | 12.05.2015 | 22.05.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Mette Harrestrup | 12.05.2015 | 22.05.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Charlotte Egelund | 12.05.2015 | 12.10.2015 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Niels Eskildsen | 12.05.2015 | 30.09.2015 | formand |
Tine Marianne Thune Kjølsen | 24.09.2012 | 12.05.2015 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Fjordbak | 24.09.2012 | 12.05.2015 | formand |
Jacob Kampp Berliner | 17.05.2011 | 30.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Anders Cleemann | 17.05.2011 | 12.05.2015 | bestyrelse |
Anne Mette Zachariassen | 17.05.2011 | 23.09.2012 | bestyrelse |
Michael Christiansen | 20.04.2010 | 22.05.2018 | bestyrelse |
Frederik Bjerregaard Sørensen | 20.04.2010 | 12.10.2015 | bestyrelse |
Peter Bysted | 20.04.2010 | 24.09.2012 | bestyrelse |
Teis Werring Bruun | 20.04.2010 | 24.09.2012 | formand |
Karen Simonsen | 20.04.2010 | 24.09.2012 | næstformand |
Claus Bendixen | 20.04.2010 | 20.09.2012 | bestyrelse |
Peter Rützou | 20.04.2010 | 17.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Gielsgaard Hargreave | 20.04.2010 | 03.09.2010 | bestyrelse |