Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ejgil Egsgaard | 22.05.2007 | 30.11.2009 | direktion |
Leif Stage Andersen | 21.11.2006 | 22.05.2007 | direktion |
Henning Reinholdt Tarp | 05.12.2005 | 21.11.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ejgil Egsgaard | 22.05.2007 | 30.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Michael Jensen | 22.05.2007 | 30.11.2009 | formand |
Leif Stage Andersen | 05.12.2005 | 30.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Henning Reinholdt Tarp | 05.12.2005 | 22.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Peter Gerlach-Hansen | 05.12.2005 | 22.05.2007 | formand |