Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Salicath | 12.02.1996 | 06.03.1998 | direktion |
Kaj Andreasen | 29.05.1995 | 23.08.1995 | adm. dir |
Kurt Jensen | 01.05.1994 | 29.05.1995 | direktion |
Peter Vest | 03.01.1994 | 27.05.1994 | direktion |
Jørgen Olsen | 12.07.1993 | 03.01.1994 | direktion |
Peter Bo Schmidt Rasmussen | 01.07.1989 | 23.05.1996 | direktion |
Lars Marthedal Andersen | 01.07.1989 | 12.07.1993 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1989 | 02.02.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Salicath | 12.02.1996 | 06.03.1998 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Andreasen | 27.05.1994 | 06.03.1998 | formand |
Leif Brask-Rasmussen | 03.01.1994 | 06.03.1998 | bestyrelse |
Peter Vest | 03.01.1994 | 27.05.1994 | bestyrelse |
Allan André Knoblauch Bernth | 12.07.1993 | 12.02.1996 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Jensen | 14.04.1993 | 03.01.1994 | formand |
Karoly Laszlo Nemeth | 01.07.1989 | 03.01.1994 | næstformand |
Jørgen Olsen | 01.07.1989 | 12.07.1993 | bestyrelse |
Lars Marthedal Andersen | 01.07.1989 | 14.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Niels Kristian Thygesen | 01.07.1989 | 21.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Anders Moesgaard | 01.07.1989 | 21.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.07.1989 | 02.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1989 | 02.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.07.1989 | 02.02.1990 | formand |