Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ib Lyngbye | 26.09.1978 | 11.12.2014 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bente Lyngbye | 26.03.2007 | 11.12.2014 | bestyrelse |
Marie-Louise Pedersen | 01.01.1999 | 24.03.2011 | bestyrelse |
Peter Lyngbye | 01.01.1999 | 26.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Ib Lyngbye | 26.09.1978 | 11.12.2014 | bestyrelse |
Ib Lyngbye | 26.09.1978 | 31.12.1998 | bestyrelse |
Bente Lyngbye | 26.09.1978 | 31.12.1998 | bestyrelse |