Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Leon Simon | 06.03.1979 | 11.01.2011 | direktion |
Lizzie Louise Ahrenkiel Simon | 06.03.1979 | 28.10.1994 | direktion |
Henrik Leon Simon | 06.03.1979 | 05.12.1991 | direktion |
John Georg Simon | 06.03.1979 | 02.07.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rudy Johannes Nielsen | 06.03.1979 | 28.10.1994 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Leon Simon | 06.03.1979 | 28.10.1994 | bestyrelse |
Lizzie Louise Ahrenkiel Simon | 06.03.1979 | 28.10.1994 | bestyrelse |
Erik Sehested Hansen | 06.03.1979 | 05.12.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jens Ole Korch | 06.03.1979 | 05.12.1991 | bestyrelse |
John Georg Simon | 06.03.1979 | 02.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Torben Ulrik Smith | 06.03.1979 | 21.11.1988 | bestyrelse |