Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Henrik Klovborg | 30.09.2014 | 02.01.2017 | direktion |
Michael Henriksen | 01.09.1985 | 30.09.2014 | direktion |
Per Carsten Korsmoe | 01.09.1985 | 10.02.1992 | direktion |
Winnie Korsmoe | 01.09.1985 | 27.12.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Henrik Klovborg | 30.09.2014 | 02.01.2017 | bestyrelse |
Lejf Agathon | 06.02.2013 | 02.01.2017 | bestyrelse |
Niels Dahl-Sørensen | 06.02.2013 | 02.01.2017 | formand |
Svend Erik Nielsen | 04.01.2007 | 06.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Michael Henriksen | 01.09.1985 | 30.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Birthe Johanne Henriksen | 01.09.1985 | 06.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Liselotte Henriksen | 01.09.1985 | 04.01.2007 | bestyrelse |
Per Carsten Korsmoe | 01.09.1985 | 09.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Winnie Korsmoe | 01.09.1985 | 09.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jon Ihlen | 01.09.1985 | 09.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Svend Olhoff | 01.09.1985 | 27.12.1989 | bestyrelse |
Hans Jørgen Thaysen | 01.09.1985 | 27.12.1989 | bestyrelse |
Hans Ove Sjoquist | 01.09.1985 | 27.12.1989 | bestyrelse |
Arne A Jensen | 01.09.1985 | 10.02.1988 | bestyrelse |