Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peder Andreas Haahr | 04.12.2001 | 29.09.2005 | direktion |
Poul Tranberg | 01.09.1985 | 04.12.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peder Andreas Haahr | 28.05.2002 | 29.09.2005 | bestyrelse |
Orla Jepsen | 28.05.2002 | 29.09.2005 | bestyrelse |
Poul Hinborg Ellund Christensen | 28.05.2002 | 29.09.2005 | formand |
Fleming Grunnet | 04.12.2001 | 28.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Chresten Jensen | 04.12.2001 | 28.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Leif Harald Wiman | 04.12.2001 | 28.05.2002 | formand |
Bertil Grandt | 05.12.2000 | 04.12.2001 | bestyrelse |
Peter Mikael Ringtved | 05.12.2000 | 04.12.2001 | formand |
Erling Johannes Damkjær | 01.09.1985 | 04.12.2001 | bestyrelse |
Poul Tranberg | 01.09.1985 | 04.12.2001 | bestyrelse |
Niels Graff | 01.09.1985 | 28.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Christian Jensen | 01.09.1985 | 13.03.1992 | bestyrelse |