Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Ove Albertsen | 01.08.1998 | 10.02.2010 | direktion |
Ove Albertsen | 07.06.1985 | 01.08.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tina Albertsen | 17.01.2003 | 10.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Lise Lotte Toft | 17.01.2003 | 10.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Benthe Albertsen | 07.06.1985 | 10.02.2010 | formand |
Ove Albertsen | 07.06.1985 | 14.11.2003 | bestyrelse |
Elvira Helga Albertsen | 07.06.1985 | 17.01.2003 | bestyrelse |