Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Block Gartmann | 21.12.2006 | 10.02.2017 | direktion |
William Palle | 15.06.2004 | 21.12.2006 | adm. dir |
Finn Vestergaard | 06.06.2003 | 15.06.2004 | adm. dir |
Per Christian Kyd Jacobsen | 14.10.1998 | 11.02.2003 | direktion |
Jørgen Rathjen | 30.09.1984 | 14.10.1998 | direktion |
Peter Christian Jørgensen | 30.09.1984 | 21.04.1995 | direktion |
Bahram Sadr-Hashemi | 30.09.1984 | 21.09.1990 | direktion |
Peter Christian Jørgensen | 30.09.1984 | 07.02.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Sonja Dive Dahl | 30.12.2015 | 10.02.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Thomas Christopher Flanagan | 30.12.2015 | 10.02.2017 | formand |
Poul Annard Stenzel | 01.12.2014 | 09.12.2016 | bestyrelse |
Daniel Twerenbold | 01.12.2014 | 30.12.2015 | formand |
Jan Petter Eilertsen | 19.06.2013 | 01.12.2014 | formand |
Atle Helle | 21.12.2012 | 30.12.2015 | bestyrelse |
Christian Josef Gartmann | 21.05.2010 | 19.06.2013 | formand |
Kim Ladeby Johnsen | 27.05.2008 | 09.12.2016 | bestyrelse |
Kim Ladeby Johnsen | 14.05.2007 | 27.05.2008 | personlig_suppleant |
Poul Annard Stenzel | 14.03.2007 | 01.12.2014 | personlig_suppleant |
Steen Block Gartmann | 21.12.2006 | 10.02.2017 | bestyrelse |
Søren Pedersen | 21.12.2006 | 01.12.2014 | bestyrelse |
Martin Creydt | 27.09.2006 | 29.06.2007 | formand |
Lars Høvids Gudbergsen | 15.06.2004 | 21.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
William Palle | 15.06.2004 | 21.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Roy Alberto Kappenberger | 13.02.2004 | 27.09.2006 | formand |
Finn Vestergaard | 19.11.2002 | 15.06.2004 | bestyrelse |
Ole Finn Skovrup | 19.11.2002 | 19.11.2002 | bestyrelse |
Simo Johannes Solavaara | 30.08.2001 | 15.06.2004 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Stendrup | 30.08.2001 | 13.02.2004 | formand |
Hans Christian Andersen | 08.02.2001 | 14.05.2007 | personlig_suppleant |
Skipper Voigt | 08.02.2001 | 21.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Søren Pedersen | 08.02.2001 | 21.12.2006 | personlig_suppleant |
Skipper Voigt | 08.02.2001 | 08.02.2001 | personlig_suppleant |
Jan Melchior Kjær Nielsen | 30.09.1999 | 30.08.2001 | formand |
Per Christian Kyd Jacobsen | 14.10.1998 | 19.11.2002 | bestyrelse |
Leo Noer | 26.02.1998 | 30.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Håkon Flak | 26.02.1998 | 14.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Puggaard-Müller | 05.03.1997 | 27.05.2008 | bestyrelse |
Bertil Nielsen | 05.03.1997 | 08.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Andersen | 05.03.1997 | 05.03.1997 | personlig_suppleant |
Gopal Krishan Sawhney | 25.11.1996 | 26.02.1998 | næstformand |
Frank Fiskers | 30.09.1984 | 30.09.1999 | formand |
Jørgen Rathjen | 30.09.1984 | 14.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Bo Glensted | 30.09.1984 | 05.03.1997 | bestyrelse |
Gorm Friborg | 30.09.1984 | 05.03.1997 | suppleant |
Mogens Stendrup | 30.09.1984 | 25.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Gullaksen | 30.09.1984 | 11.06.1996 | formand |
Peter Christian Jørgensen | 30.09.1984 | 21.04.1995 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Jan Nico Oldenburger | 30.09.1984 | 21.04.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jens Erling Svensson | 30.09.1984 | 04.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Bahram Sadr-Hashemi | 30.09.1984 | 04.11.1992 | formand |
Kurt Eduard Ritter | 30.09.1984 | 21.09.1990 | formand |
Karl Otto Skogland | 30.09.1984 | 04.03.1988 | bestyrelse |
Svein Edvin Hansen | 30.09.1984 | 04.03.1988 | bestyrelse |
Steinar Georg Wilhelm Lindblom | 30.09.1984 | 04.03.1988 | formand |