Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Hedam Christensen | 01.11.1994 | 11.01.1996 | direktion |
Arne Henriksen | 04.04.1984 | 19.09.2003 | direktion |
Jørgen Toft Jespersen | 04.04.1984 | 19.09.2003 | direktion |
Susanne Martha Larsen | 04.04.1984 | 08.11.1994 | direktion |
Bent Hemberg | 04.04.1984 | 08.09.1994 | direktion |
Preben Tommy Knudsen | 04.04.1984 | 15.04.1994 | direktion |
Jørgen Finn Malmos | 04.04.1984 | 10.04.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Hedam Christensen | 01.11.1994 | 11.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Torben Pedersen | 04.04.1984 | 11.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Arne Henriksen | 04.04.1984 | 11.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Martha Larsen | 04.04.1984 | 08.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Torsten Drud Christensen | 04.04.1984 | 10.04.1989 | suppleant |