Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Friberg | 30.06.1983 | 13.11.1992 | direktion |
Tonni Nygaard Matthes | 30.06.1983 | 01.11.1991 | direktion |
Paul Mathiasen Leth | 30.06.1983 | 02.04.1991 | direktion |
Tonni Nygaard Matthes | 30.06.1983 | 15.11.1990 | direktion |
Leo Gunnar Magnusson | 30.06.1983 | 22.02.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jimmy Friberg | 30.06.1983 | 13.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Friberg | 30.06.1983 | 13.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Lis Friberg | 30.06.1983 | 13.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Dennis Nygaard Mogensen | 30.06.1983 | 01.11.1991 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Nygaard | 30.06.1983 | 01.11.1991 | bestyrelse |
Tonni Nygaard Matthes | 30.06.1983 | 01.11.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Kerl Cardel | 30.06.1983 | 02.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Paul Mathiasen Leth | 30.06.1983 | 02.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Anne Liv Langballe | 30.06.1983 | 02.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Dennis Nygaard Mogensen | 30.06.1983 | 15.11.1990 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Nygaard | 30.06.1983 | 15.11.1990 | bestyrelse |
Tonni Nygaard Matthes | 30.06.1983 | 15.11.1990 | bestyrelse |
Minna Alice Magnusson | 30.06.1983 | 22.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Lina Sessan Lorentzen | 30.06.1983 | 22.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Lennart Stig Magnusson | 30.06.1983 | 22.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Leo Gunnar Magnusson | 30.06.1983 | 22.02.1990 | bestyrelse |