Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Michael Simonsen | 11.05.1983 | 14.04.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens-Michael Hørlyck Simonsen | 24.01.2003 | 14.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
John Hørlyck Simonsen | 24.01.2003 | 14.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Edni Ruth Hørlyck Simonsen | 24.05.1995 | 24.01.2003 | bestyrelse |
Kai Michelsen | 11.05.1983 | 14.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Jens Michael Simonsen | 11.05.1983 | 14.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Svend-Aage Larsen | 11.05.1983 | 24.05.1995 | bestyrelse |