Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karl Vagn Jensen | 15.04.1982 | 20.10.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karl Vagn Jensen | 15.04.1982 | 27.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Sigurd Hansen | 15.04.1982 | 27.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Anni Lillelund Christensen | 15.04.1982 | 27.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jens Aage Thomasen | 15.04.1982 | 19.11.1987 | bestyrelse |
Ingevald Elbæk Damgaard | 15.04.1982 | 19.11.1987 | bestyrelse |