Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Asmussen | 02.12.1981 | 23.10.1996 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anna Asmussen | 02.12.1981 | 23.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Svend Nielsen | 02.12.1981 | 23.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Kay Ulf Larsen | 02.12.1981 | 23.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Knud Valdemar Larsen | 02.12.1981 | 03.02.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ole Asmussen | 02.12.1981 | 03.02.1994 | bestyrelse |
Hemming Nielsen | 02.12.1981 | 20.12.1990 | bestyrelse |
Kirstine Pedersen Enevoldsen | 02.12.1981 | 03.05.1989 | bestyrelse |