Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Rasmussen | 01.11.1981 | 16.03.2005 | direktion |
Bent Rasmussen | 01.11.1981 | 06.11.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Rasmussen | 01.11.1981 | 16.03.2005 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Rasmussen | 01.11.1981 | 16.03.2005 | bestyrelse |
Poul Rasmussen | 01.11.1981 | 26.10.1993 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Max Larsen | 01.11.1981 | 24.09.1992 | bestyrelse |
Peter Staby Frost | 01.11.1981 | 22.02.1988 | bestyrelse |
Ivan Kyed | 01.11.1981 | 22.02.1988 | bestyrelse |