Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Peter Hem | 26.06.1981 | 20.12.2004 | direktion |
Thomas Alexander North Harttung | 26.06.1981 | 01.08.1994 | direktion |
Claus Johan Thomas de Neergaard | 26.06.1981 | 12.04.1991 | direktion |
Preben Christian Wistisen | 26.06.1981 | 02.11.1987 | direktion |
Henrik Hougaard | 26.06.1981 | 02.11.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Randi Hem | 22.06.2000 | 20.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Bo Seiffert | 22.01.1998 | 20.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Helle Hem Pedersen | 22.01.1998 | 22.06.2000 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Ove Svenningsen | 01.11.1995 | 22.01.1998 | formand |
Joan Thyra Hem | 22.09.1995 | 20.12.2004 | formand |
Jens Peter Hem | 26.06.1981 | 20.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Alexander North Harttung | 26.06.1981 | 22.09.1995 | formand |
Claus Johan Thomas de Neergaard | 26.06.1981 | 01.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Morten Vagner Knudsen | 26.06.1981 | 01.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Erik Andersen Stridbæk | 26.06.1981 | 01.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Peter Hem | 26.06.1981 | 01.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Hougaard | 26.06.1981 | 12.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Diana Daniela Hidalgo Foss | 26.06.1981 | 12.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Toke Alexander Foss | 26.06.1981 | 12.04.1991 | formand |