Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Drage Gudmandsen | 04.06.1999 | 20.07.2007 | direktion |
Henning Gudmandsen | 10.09.1980 | 02.10.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Gudmandsen | 15.01.2008 | 02.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Jan Drage Gudmandsen | 15.01.2008 | 02.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Tom Johnsen | 15.01.2008 | 02.10.2009 | formand |