Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Nauf Thisted | 15.11.1951 | 16.08.2004 | direktion |
Hans Albert Hey | 15.11.1951 | 07.08.1991 | direktion |
Per Grubert | 15.11.1951 | 05.09.1988 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tommy Melle | 04.04.2001 | 16.08.2004 | formand |
Søren Eusebius Jakobsen | 07.02.2000 | 16.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Steffen Kragh | 15.04.1999 | 04.04.2001 | formand |
Christian Jørgensen | 01.06.1998 | 15.04.1999 | formand |
Ole Nauf Thisted | 20.01.1995 | 16.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Ulrik Bülow | 20.01.1995 | 01.06.1998 | formand |
Karl Skovbæch Pedersen | 15.11.1951 | 07.02.2000 | bestyrelse |
Arne Øhrgaard | 15.11.1951 | 20.01.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ole Jørgen Timm | 15.11.1951 | 20.01.1995 | formand |
Carsten Fredholm | 15.11.1951 | 19.05.1994 | bestyrelse |
Sven-Åke Nilsson | 15.11.1951 | 28.02.1994 | bestyrelse |
Steen Rønlev | 15.11.1951 | 28.02.1994 | formand |
Hans Albert Hey | 15.11.1951 | 16.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Per Grubert | 15.11.1951 | 05.09.1988 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Husum Vilsøe | 15.11.1951 | 05.09.1988 | formand |