Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Møller | 01.07.1981 | 21.10.2008 | direktion |
Holger Knud Christiansen | 01.07.1981 | 12.01.1996 | direktion |
Erling Nielsen | 01.07.1981 | 07.11.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Villy Naundrup Pedersen | 01.07.1981 | 21.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
John Moesgaard | 01.07.1981 | 21.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jens Møller | 01.07.1981 | 21.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
Benny Klink | 01.07.1981 | 09.01.1999 | bestyrelse |
Emil Rasmussen | 01.07.1981 | 07.11.1991 | bestyrelse |
Holger Knud Christiansen | 01.07.1981 | 07.11.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Qviste | 01.07.1981 | 14.02.1991 | bestyrelse |