Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Peter Schmidt | 22.05.1943 | 10.12.1992 | direktion |
Carl Andreas Schmidt | 22.05.1943 | 20.03.1989 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Peter Schmidt | 22.05.1943 | 10.12.1992 | bestyrelse |
Claus Willumsen | 22.05.1943 | 10.12.1992 | bestyrelse |
Kim Bruhn-Petersen | 22.05.1943 | 10.12.1992 | bestyrelse |
Elisabeth Maria Lindegaard Poulsen | 22.05.1943 | 04.06.1991 | bestyrelse |
Carl Andreas Schmidt | 22.05.1943 | 04.06.1991 | bestyrelse |
Ingrid Forsberg Schmidt | 22.05.1943 | 04.06.1991 | bestyrelse |