Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Holm | 31.03.2011 | 19.11.2014 | adm. dir |
Henrik Ellersgaard Holm | 28.09.2010 | 30.06.2012 | direktion |
Torben Holm | 10.11.1975 | 28.09.2010 | direktion |
Hans Erik Larsen | 10.11.1975 | 15.02.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Holm | 10.11.1975 | 28.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Grethe Holm | 10.11.1975 | 28.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Anna Erhardine Larsen | 10.11.1975 | 15.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Hans Erik Larsen | 10.11.1975 | 15.02.1993 | bestyrelse |