Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steffen Lindhardt Nørgaard | 29.06.1999 | 22.11.2000 | direktion |
Hans Jørgen Uggerby | 18.06.1965 | 29.06.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Heide Ottosen | 25.10.2000 | 22.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Pedersen | 10.12.1999 | 25.10.2000 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Hougaard | 29.06.1999 | 22.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Jens Madsen | 29.06.1999 | 22.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Peter Erik Hansen | 29.06.1999 | 22.11.2000 | formand |
Ove Glerup | 29.06.1999 | 22.11.2000 | næstformand |
Jørn Mogens Nielsen | 29.06.1999 | 10.12.1999 | bestyrelse |
Karen Kirstine Uggerly | 18.06.1965 | 29.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Hans Jørgen Uggerby | 18.06.1965 | 29.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Tut Uggerby | 18.06.1965 | 29.06.1999 | bestyrelse |