Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Christian Olsen | 28.06.1974 | 07.09.2005 | direktion |
Michael Staufeldt | 28.06.1974 | 16.08.1993 | direktion |
John Stig Dyvendal | 28.06.1974 | 15.01.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Christian Olsen | 28.06.1974 | 07.09.2005 | bestyrelse |
Glenn Olsen | 28.06.1974 | 07.09.2005 | bestyrelse |
Michael Olsen | 28.06.1974 | 07.09.2005 | formand |
Michael Staufeldt | 28.06.1974 | 16.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Richard J Hayes | 28.06.1974 | 16.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Christopher Johnson | 28.06.1974 | 16.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Pieter Van der Linden | 28.06.1974 | 15.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Clive Norman Brinker Johnston | 28.06.1974 | 15.01.1992 | formand |
David Charles Shepley-Cuthbert | 28.06.1974 | 05.08.1988 | bestyrelse |