Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claus Christian Bjerring | 18.01.2008 | 02.12.2009 | adm. dir |
Ole Nørgaard Andersen | 31.12.1978 | 18.01.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Arevad Munch | 18.01.2008 | 02.12.2009 | bestyrelse |
Claus Christian Bjerring | 18.01.2008 | 02.12.2009 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Birk Nielsen | 18.01.2008 | 02.12.2009 | formand |
Vagn Larsen | 29.08.2002 | 18.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Ole Nørgaard Andersen | 31.12.1978 | 02.12.2009 | bestyrelse |
Erik Daugaard Christensen | 31.12.1978 | 18.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Signe Nørgaard Andersen | 31.12.1978 | 18.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Eva Kristine Andersen | 31.12.1978 | 27.01.1993 | bestyrelse |