Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Bindesbøl | 13.10.1997 | 10.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Christian Jakobsen | 13.10.1997 | 10.02.2010 | suppleant |
Hans Bindesbøl | 13.10.1997 | 13.10.1997 | suppleant |
Hans Medum Nielsen | 26.10.1983 | 10.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Niels Christian Nielsen | 26.10.1983 | 10.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Hans Kristian Raunkjær | 26.10.1983 | 10.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Niels Peter Nielsen | 26.10.1983 | 10.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Robert Jensen | 26.10.1983 | 13.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Vagn Andreasen | 26.10.1983 | 05.11.1996 | suppleant |