Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Svend Erik Sørensen | 02.04.1997 | 06.07.1998 | bestyrelse |
Aage Sønder Kristensen | 02.04.1997 | 06.07.1998 | formand |
Hardy Hellegaard | 08.10.1900 | 06.07.1998 | bestyrelse |
Aase Lillelund Jensen | 08.10.1900 | 06.07.1998 | bestyrelse |
Karen Lisbeth Dalgaard | 08.10.1900 | 06.07.1998 | bestyrelse |
Svend Aage Nyby | 08.10.1900 | 06.07.1998 | suppleant |
Arne Iversen | 08.10.1900 | 02.04.1997 | formand |
Inge Larsen | 08.10.1900 | 22.04.1996 | bestyrelse |