Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Anker Tschiersch | 01.01.2022 | 19.08.2022 | adm. dir |
Klaus Brock | 01.02.2021 | 31.12.2021 | direktør |
Brian Walter Faust | 21.10.2020 | 01.02.2021 | adm. dir |
Klaus Brock | 02.05.2019 | 21.10.2020 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Klaus Brock | 15.02.2021 | 19.08.2022 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Kristian Bech Kørvell | 15.02.2021 | 19.08.2022 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Henrik Wendelboe | 15.02.2021 | 19.08.2022 | formand |
Per Lachenmeier | 01.02.2021 | 19.08.2022 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Ole Anker Tschiersch | 01.02.2021 | 19.08.2022 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Klaus Brock | 01.02.2021 | 14.02.2021 | formand |
Christian Foder | 02.05.2019 | 01.02.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Brian Walter Faust | 02.05.2019 | 01.02.2021 | formand |
Klaus Brock | 02.05.2019 | 31.01.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |