Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Munck Loiborg | 25.09.2015 | 19.06.2017 | adm. dir |
Anders Gregers Pedersen | 30.11.1995 | 25.09.2015 | direktion |
Morten Henrik Pedersen | 23.03.1972 | 16.01.1996 | direktion |
Henrik Pedersen | 23.03.1972 | 18.01.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Wulff Skovgaard | 31.03.2014 | 25.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Peter Krarup Lange | 31.03.2014 | 25.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Munck Loiborg | 01.01.2013 | 25.09.2015 | formand |
Susanne Pedersen | 01.10.2004 | 31.03.2014 | bestyrelse |
Tom Gunnar Høeg | 19.09.2001 | 01.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Pedersen | 30.12.1998 | 01.01.2013 | formand |
Anders Gregers Pedersen | 30.11.1995 | 31.03.2014 | bestyrelse |
Palle Skov Jensen | 29.06.1995 | 16.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Morten Henrik Pedersen | 23.03.1972 | 19.09.2001 | bestyrelse |
Wivi Hürwitz Larsen | 23.03.1972 | 30.12.1998 | formand |
Henrik Pedersen | 23.03.1972 | 16.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Steen Erik Mønsted | 23.03.1972 | 29.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Svend Petersen | 23.03.1972 | 18.01.1993 | bestyrelse |