Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Maureen Sylvia Appelberg | 26.03.1997 | 22.09.1999 | direktion |
Lars Christian Appelberg | 01.04.1974 | 19.11.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Maureen Sylvia Appelberg | 26.03.1997 | 26.03.1997 | bestyrelse |
Anna Zehngraff Knightbridge | 01.04.1974 | 26.03.1997 | bestyrelse |
Lars Christian Appelberg | 01.04.1974 | 26.03.1997 | bestyrelse |
Anne Marie Ørving | 01.04.1974 | 25.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jens Christian Appelberg | 01.04.1974 | 25.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Tom Zehngraff | 01.04.1974 | 25.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Maureen Sylvia Appelberg | 01.04.1974 | 30.06.1989 | suppleant |