Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Cristel Cristine Catherine Aaen Emé | 03.10.2017 | 13.04.2021 | adm. dir |
Aleksander William Aaen Emé | 03.10.2016 | 03.10.2017 | adm. dir |
Cristel Cristine Catherine Aaen Emé | 03.10.2016 | 01.01.2017 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Cristel Cristine Catherine Aaen Emé | 03.10.2017 | 13.04.2021 | formand |
Aleksander William Aaen Emé | 03.10.2016 | 03.10.2017 | næstformand |
Cristel Cristine Catherine Aaen Emé | 03.10.2016 | 01.01.2017 | formand |