Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dines Holm | 02.06.2012 | 25.01.2019 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jacob Sture Kamstrup-Larsen | 27.12.2017 | 25.01.2019 | formand |
Jacob Sture Kamstrup-Larsen | 06.06.2017 | 26.12.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Dines Holm | 02.06.2012 | 25.01.2019 | bestyrelse |
Søren Kristoffersen | 02.06.2012 | 27.12.2017 | formand |
Flemming Stolling | 02.06.2012 | 06.06.2017 | bestyrelse |