Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christiane Karlsen | 15.12.2011 | 30.05.2017 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Stokholm Futtrup | 21.01.2015 | 30.05.2017 | formand |
Palle Højsholt | 15.12.2011 | 30.05.2017 | bestyrelse |
Christiane Karlsen | 15.12.2011 | 30.05.2017 | bestyrelse |
John Nørgård Tobiesen | 15.12.2011 | 21.01.2015 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Makholm | 15.12.2011 | 27.05.2013 | formand |