Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Majbrit Weidemann | 01.01.2012 | 22.12.2014 | adm. dir |
Joen Weidemann | 08.09.2011 | 22.04.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Joen Weidemann | 29.04.2013 | 22.12.2014 | formand |
Majbrit Weidemann | 30.04.2012 | 22.12.2014 | bestyrelse |
Lars Mathiesen | 30.04.2012 | 29.04.2013 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Christensen Pedersen | 30.04.2012 | 29.04.2013 | formand |