Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Steenholt | 07.01.2005 | 11.03.2010 | direktion |
Kai Steenholt | 26.06.1971 | 07.01.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Inge Marie Kjølhede Steenholt | 26.06.1971 | 27.12.1990 | bestyrelse |
Erling Knoth | 26.06.1971 | 27.12.1990 | bestyrelse |
Kai Steenholt | 26.06.1971 | 27.12.1990 | bestyrelse |