Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Gangsted-Rasmussen | 30.06.2017 | 30.06.2021 | adm. dir |
Kenn Righolt | 01.09.2010 | 30.06.2017 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anne-Marie Walsøe | 30.06.2017 | 20.05.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Niels Christian Gangsted-Rasmussen | 01.09.2010 | 20.05.2020 | bestyrelse |
Anders Gangsted-Rasmussen | 01.09.2010 | 20.05.2020 | bestyrelse |
Kenn Righolt | 01.09.2010 | 30.06.2017 | bestyrelse |