Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Casper Tind Hansen | 01.02.2013 | 31.05.2017 | adm. dir |
Morten Jeppe Buch-Pedersen | 30.03.2009 | 31.01.2013 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Emmanuelle Coutanceau | 03.02.2016 | 31.05.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Klaus Christian Schollmeier | 16.11.2015 | 31.05.2017 | formand |
Casper Tind Hansen | 16.12.2013 | 31.05.2017 | bestyrelse |
Ilka Wicke | 16.12.2013 | 31.05.2017 | bestyrelse |
Nanna Liebach Lüneborg | 16.12.2013 | 03.02.2016 | bestyrelse |
Islam Khalid | 28.09.2011 | 22.09.2015 | formand |
Jørn Frederik Falch | 18.08.2010 | 16.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Stephan Christgau | 18.08.2010 | 16.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Anne-Marie Lund Winther | 30.03.2009 | 16.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Morten Jeppe Buch-Pedersen | 30.03.2009 | 18.08.2010 | bestyrelse |
Claus Elsborg Olesen | 30.03.2009 | 18.08.2010 | formand |