Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Boje Lund | 04.04.2008 | 16.09.2010 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Knud Erik Andreasen | 27.11.2009 | 16.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Hans Peder Wagner | 23.12.2008 | 16.09.2010 | formand |
Hans Jørgen Lund | 23.12.2008 | 27.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Niels Boje Lund | 22.12.2008 | 16.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Willi Mei Hansen | 04.04.2008 | 23.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Trine Baadsgaard | 04.04.2008 | 23.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Niels Boje Lund | 04.04.2008 | 23.12.2008 | formand |