Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Schaumann | 10.09.2008 | 04.03.2013 | direktion |
Anders Halberg | 28.11.2007 | 10.09.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Schaumann | 24.09.2010 | 04.03.2013 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Landstrøm | 24.09.2010 | 04.03.2013 | formand |
Leif Vejhe Djurhuus | 28.11.2007 | 04.03.2013 | bestyrelse |
Anders Halberg | 28.11.2007 | 10.09.2008 | bestyrelse |