Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Nikolaj Stampe | 05.07.2007 | 15.10.2014 | direktion |
Caroline Sundorph Pontoppidan | 11.06.2007 | 05.07.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Henrik Thornval | 30.05.2012 | 15.10.2014 | bestyrelse |
Nikolaj Stampe | 05.07.2007 | 15.10.2014 | bestyrelse |
Michael Nellemann Pedersen | 05.07.2007 | 15.10.2014 | bestyrelse |
Birger Grubbe | 05.07.2007 | 15.10.2014 | formand |
Johannes Vang Pedersen | 05.07.2007 | 30.05.2012 | bestyrelse |