Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Munk Nielsen | 24.04.2010 | 21.07.2014 | bestyrelse |
Fritz Larsen | 24.04.2010 | 21.07.2014 | bestyrelse |
Katja Gindrup | 24.04.2010 | 21.07.2014 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Jacobsen Lorentzen | 27.04.2008 | 24.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Erik Berg Andersen | 27.04.2008 | 24.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Villads Vilfred Bojsen Vind | 27.04.2008 | 24.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Allan Munk Nielsen | 15.02.2007 | 27.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Fritz Larsen | 15.02.2007 | 27.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Katja Gindrup | 15.02.2007 | 27.04.2008 | bestyrelse |