Bestyrelse | Dato | Rolle |
---|---|---|
Jesper Nicolaisen | 25.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Peter Jørgen Nicolaisen | 25.05.2011 | formand |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Keld Sundenæs | 26.04.2007 | 05.01.2012 | bestyrelse |
Karl-Heinz Schulz | 26.04.2007 | 26.04.2007 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Egefeld Schimming | 25.10.2006 | 25.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
John Stig Hansen | 25.10.2006 | 26.04.2007 | bestyrelse |