Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henriette Irminger Sonne | 22.09.2015 | 08.08.2016 | adm. dir |
Mikkel Irminger Sarbo | 28.11.2014 | 21.09.2015 | adm. dir |
Henrik Mühlendorph | 01.06.2014 | 28.11.2014 | adm. dir |
Mette Marie Viscor | 19.04.2006 | 31.05.2014 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mikkel Irminger Sarbo | 19.04.2006 | 08.08.2016 | bestyrelse |
Mette Marie Viscor | 19.04.2006 | 09.08.2014 | bestyrelse |