Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Lautrup | 03.09.2007 | 03.07.2009 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Kornbo | 03.09.2007 | 03.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jens Schaumann | 04.04.2006 | 03.07.2009 | formand |
Kurt Benny Kahla | 04.04.2006 | 03.09.2007 | bestyrelse |
Anders Halberg | 04.04.2006 | 03.09.2007 | bestyrelse |