Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Munk Nielsen | 24.04.2010 | 07.03.2014 | bestyrelse |
Katja Gindrup | 24.04.2010 | 07.03.2014 | bestyrelse |
Fritz Larsen | 18.04.2007 | 07.03.2014 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Aldershvile | 18.04.2007 | 24.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Erik Berg Andersen | 18.04.2007 | 24.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Allan Munk Nielsen | 02.01.2006 | 18.04.2007 | bestyrelse |
Fritz Larsen | 02.01.2006 | 18.04.2007 | bestyrelse |
Katja Gindrup | 02.01.2006 | 18.04.2007 | bestyrelse |