Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Brian Danny Vangsted | 28.08.2009 | 06.09.2011 | direktion |
Kim Hermann Andersen | 01.06.2007 | 31.08.2009 | adm. dir |
Peter Børsen Juhl | 09.11.2006 | 01.06.2007 | adm. dir |
Flemming Thrane | 14.02.2006 | 09.11.2006 | direktion |
Kim Hermann Andersen | 14.02.2006 | 09.11.2006 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Thrane | 28.08.2009 | 06.09.2011 | bestyrelse |
Arne Vangsted | 14.07.2005 | 06.09.2011 | bestyrelse |
Per Conradsen | 14.07.2005 | 06.09.2011 | formand |
Kim Hermann Andersen | 14.07.2005 | 31.08.2009 | bestyrelse |
Peter Børsen Juhl | 14.07.2005 | 01.06.2007 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Thrane | 14.07.2005 | 01.06.2007 | bestyrelse |