Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jon Magne Soløy | 01.05.2004 | 17.09.2015 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Siri Lie Østreng | 10.02.2011 | 17.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Torbjørn Larsen | 19.03.2009 | 10.02.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jon Magne Soløy | 01.05.2004 | 17.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Henning Jæger | 01.05.2004 | 17.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Juan Saplana Peinado | 01.05.2004 | 19.03.2009 | bestyrelse |