Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karsten Haahr | 05.03.2004 | 06.04.2016 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lisianne Jakobsen | 03.02.2015 | 06.04.2016 | formand |
Monica Schrøder | 27.02.2007 | 03.02.2015 | formand |
Karsten Haahr | 05.03.2004 | 06.04.2016 | bestyrelse |
Gregers Valdemar Haahr | 05.03.2004 | 06.04.2016 | bestyrelse |
Inge Haahr | 05.03.2004 | 27.02.2007 | bestyrelse |