Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Sefer Akbina | 01.10.2007 | 19.10.2009 | direktion |
Cevat Akinci | 01.12.2006 | 01.10.2007 | direktion |
Birol Køse | 01.12.2006 | 01.10.2007 | direktion |
Ali Fener | 12.09.2005 | 01.12.2006 | direktion |
Ergin Soyler | 01.09.2003 | 01.10.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Sefer Akbina | 01.10.2007 | 19.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Ergin Soyler | 01.10.2007 | 19.10.2009 | formand |
Hamit Karaca | 01.09.2003 | 19.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Mustafa Cetin | 01.09.2003 | 18.04.2006 | formand |