Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mark Ian Rønn | 24.09.2007 | 04.02.2012 | adm. dir |
Ole Alstrup | 25.09.2003 | 24.09.2007 | direktion |
Shehab Zenussi | 25.09.2003 | 30.10.2006 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.2003 | 25.09.2003 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Alstrup | 24.09.2007 | 24.09.2007 | suppleant |
Shehab Zenussi | 30.10.2006 | 04.02.2012 | formand |
Mark Ian Rønn | 30.10.2006 | 04.02.2012 | næstformand |